NH SB219 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB219
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-04 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-04 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a one-time allowance for certain state retirees.
Title
Relative to a one-time allowance for certain state retirees.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Michael McCarthy [R] | Rep. Betsy McKinney [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Rep. David Danielson [R] | Rep. Patricia Dowling [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Franklin Sterling [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Rerefer to Committee (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB219 (Carry Over) 2017-10-04 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate