NH SB218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 218 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 218 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to duties of the commissioner of transportation regarding air navigation facilities.
Title
Relative to duties of the commissioner of transportation regarding air navigation facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - OTP (Y: 206 N: 148 NV: 10 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - OTP (Y: 206 N: 148 NV: 10 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 218 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22 |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/10/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-148 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 11 |
2019-06-06 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Failed DV 154-196 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 11 |
2019-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation for 06/05/2019 (Vote Tie; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 21 |
2019-05-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/28/2019 11:01 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-05-01 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |