NH SB218 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-158; House Journal 44, PG. 1838-1840
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Making spoofing an unfair and deceptive act under the consumer protection law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making spoofing an unfair and deceptive act under the consumer protection law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 203 N: 158 NV: 12 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-03HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-158; House Journal 44, PG. 1838-1840
2015-05-27HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1831h (NT)
2015-05-27HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jun 3 (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1633
2015-05-13HouseContinued Executive Session: 5/19/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-05-06HouseExecutive Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED==
2015-04-07HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 4/28/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-03-25HousePublic Hearing: 4/2/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2015-03-04HouseIntroduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 22, PG. 629
2015-02-19SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6
2015-02-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/19/15; Senate Calendar 10
2015-02-03SenateHearing: 2/10/15, Room 100, State House, 11:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback