NH SB218 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/19/2012; Chapter 0272; Effective 06/19/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to electric renewable portfolio standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to electric renewable portfolio standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-06 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report 2392 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - C OF C #2392C (REP J.GARRITY) (Y: 292 N: 52 NV: 31 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - OTP/AM 2180H (Y: 275 N: 6 NV: 36 Abs: 80) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-19 Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/19/2012; Chapter 0272; Effective 06/19/2012
2012-06-06 Senate Enrolled
2012-06-06 House Enrolled
2012-06-06 Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-2499e Adopted
2012-06-06 House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2499e Adopted; House Journal 51, PG.2611
2012-06-06 Senate Conference Committee Report 2392c; Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Adopted
2012-06-06 House Conference Committee Report #2392c Adopted, Regular Calendar 292-52; House Journal 51, PG.2539-2543
2012-05-31 House Conference Committee Report #2012-2392c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 42, PG.2263
2012-05-25 Senate C OF C Meeting: ==ROOM CHANGE== 5/25/2012, 1:00 p.m., Room 210-211, Legislative Office Building
2012-05-24 Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/25/2012, 1:00 p.m., Room 304, Legislative Office Building
2012-05-24 House Speaker Appoints: Reps J.Garrity, Holden, W.O'Connor, Levasseur [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2488
2012-05-24 House House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Tucker) [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2488
2012-05-23 Senate President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Lambert, and Merrill
2012-05-23 Senate Sen. Odell Moved Non-concur with House Amendment #2180h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2012-05-17 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2180h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 275-6; House Journal 46, PG.2449-2452
2012-05-17 House Amendment #2180h: Amendment Adopted Division Vote 202-76; House Journal 46, PG.2449-2450
2012-05-09 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-2180h; House Calendar 37, PG.2066-2068
2012-05-09 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2180h for May 15 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2047
2012-05-09 House Continued Executive Session: 5/9/2012 1:10 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2012-04-19 House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==Recessed==
2012-04-18 House Full Committee Work Session: 5/3/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2012-04-18 House Full Committee Work Session: 4/24/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2012-04-04 House Full Committee Work Session: 4/10/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2012-03-29 House Public Hearing: 4/5/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2012-03-21 House Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 28, PG.1719
2012-03-21 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1235s, 1368s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7, Pg.256
2012-03-21 Senate Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2012-1368s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.226
2012-03-21 Senate Committee Amendment 1235s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.222
2012-03-15 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1235s, 3/21/12; Senate Calendar 11
2012-02-09 Senate Hearing: 2/16/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7
2012-01-01 Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1, Pg.3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback