NH SB216 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1826
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1826
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sales of alcoholic beverages by manufacturers.
Title
Relative to sales of alcoholic beverages by manufacturers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1826 |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jun 3 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1629 |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0710s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0710s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0710s, New Title, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/5/15, Room 100, State House, 2:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |