NH SB215 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle liability insurance policy minimum coverage.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle liability insurance policy minimum coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |