NH SB215 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 276; Effective 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to learning to drive and commercial motor vehicles designed to transport passengers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to learning to drive and commercial motor vehicles designed to transport passengers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 276; Effective 07/19/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Watters Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1846h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 19
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1846h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 19
2019-05-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1846h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 7
2019-05-01HouseExecutive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-04-23HousePublic Hearing: 04/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-11SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:50 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback