NH SB215 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an option to rebate the research and development tax credit against business profits taxes.
Title
Establishing an option to rebate the research and development tax credit against business profits taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Sen. Andrew Hosmer [D] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 103, State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |