NH SB215 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0216; Effective 01/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing benefit corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing benefit corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-23 - House - OTP (Y: 216 N: 101 NV: 21 Abs: 49) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-18SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0216; Effective 01/01/2015
2014-05-15SenateEnrolled
2014-05-15HouseEnrolled
2014-05-07SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1628e Adopted, Voice Vote 05/01/14
2014-05-05HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1628eba Adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 216-101
2014-04-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study
2014-04-17HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 31
2014-04-09HouseExcutive Session: 4/15/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2014-04-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 4/9/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2014-03-25HousePublic Hearing: 4/1/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2014-03-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
2014-02-19SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 0563s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg
2014-02-19SenateCommittee Amendment 0563s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2014-02-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0563s, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7
2014-01-16SenateHearing: 1/23/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 3
2013-12-11SenateIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback