NH SB212 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2017; Chapter 0189; Effective 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2017; Chapter 0189; Effective 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the physical therapy licensure compact.
Title
Establishing the physical therapy licensure compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2017; Chapter 0189; Effective 07/01/2017 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 25 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2377e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2377e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 10 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1372h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2017-06-01 | House | Amendment #2017-1372h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1372h for 06/01/2017 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 8 |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-04-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/12/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-04-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/12/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-04-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/11/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 8 P. 46 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/08/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |