NH SB211 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0216; Effective 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0216; Effective 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to taxation of employee leasing companies under the business enterprise tax.
Title
Relative to taxation of employee leasing companies under the business enterprise tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0216; Effective 07/01/2015 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Concurs with House Amendment #1240h, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1240h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1595 |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment #1240h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1595 |
2015-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1240h for Apr 29 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1489 |
2015-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/9/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-04-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/9/2015 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-25 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 3/31/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 3/31/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 26. PG. 1274 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0510s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0510s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0510s, 3/5/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 2/17/15, Room 100, State House, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |