NH SB21 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Enrolled 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to notice to cut timber.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to notice to cut timber.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 87
2019-04-30HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-04-30HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 16
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/23/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback