NH SB21 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2017; Chapter 0147; Effective 08/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2017; Chapter 0147; Effective 08/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure and continuing education of architects.
Title
Relative to licensure and continuing education of architects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Sections 3 and 4 (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2017; Chapter 0147; Effective 08/15/2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/11/2017); Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-17 | House | Enrolled 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 48 |
2017-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 4 |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/04/2017 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 5 |
2017-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2017 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 26 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0876s, Regular Calendar 19Y-4N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sections 3 & 4, Regular Calendar 19Y-4N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The Chair Ruled Not Divisible; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved to Further Divide the Question on Section 3; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sections 1, 2 & 4, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/23/2017 Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved to divide the Question on SB 21 As Amended: Sections 1,2 and 4 and Sections 3 and 4; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0876s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0876s, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to refer SB 21 back to Executive Departments and Administration, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove SB 21 from the Consent Calendar; 02/19/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0015s, 02/09/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Special Order SB 21 to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0015s, 01/19/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |