NH SB21 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2013; Chapter 0126; Effective 06/25/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2013; Chapter 0126; Effective 06/25/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making technical corrections to the International Registration Plan.
Title
Making technical corrections to the International Registration Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2013; Chapter 0126; Effective 06/25/2013 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 45, PG.1527 |
2013-05-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1471 |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 22 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar39, PG.1262 |
2013-05-01 | House | Executive Session: 5/14/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-04-08 | House | Public Hearing: 4/23/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |