NH SB209 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Lay SB209 on Table (Rep. Harriott-Gathright): Motion Adopted DV 357-9 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Lay SB209 on Table (Rep. Harriott-Gathright): Motion Adopted DV 357-9 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to providing menstrual hygiene products at no cost to individuals who biologically menstruate in state and county correctional facilities.
Title
Relative to providing menstrual hygiene products at no cost to individuals who biologically menstruate in state and county correctional facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Lay SB209 on Table (Rep. Harriott-Gathright): Motion Adopted DV 357-9 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 20 |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/30/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) |
2023-03-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/30/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0654s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0654s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0654s, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/16/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |