NH SB208 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Enrolled 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Renaming the adjutant general's department to the department of military affairs and veterans services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renaming the adjutant general's department to the department of military affairs and veterans services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-17SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2457e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2457e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-05-30SenateSen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1380h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 8
2019-05-02HouseAmendment # 2019-1380h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 8
2019-04-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1380h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 7
2019-03-26HouseExecutive Session: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-26House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/30/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback