NH SB204 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0171; Effective 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring trauma kits to be available in state-owned buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring trauma kits to be available in state-owned buildings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-01SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0171; Effective 07/01/2023
2023-06-28SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/15/2023); Senate Journal 20
2023-06-28HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 16
2023-06-15SenateSen. Pearl Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19
2023-06-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2023-2080h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 44
2023-06-08HouseAmendment # 2023-2080h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 44
2023-06-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2080h 06/01/2023 (Vote 24-1; Regular Calendar)
2023-05-31HouseExecutive Session: 06/01/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2023-05-22HouseDivision Work Session: 05/31/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 212
2023-05-04HouseReferred to Finance 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 14
2023-05-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 14
2023-04-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass 03/29/2023 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
2023-04-13HouseExecutive Session: 03/29/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2023-03-21HousePublic Hearing: 03/29/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2023-03-20HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration
2023-03-09SenateCommittee Amendment # 2023-0675s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9
2023-03-09SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2023-0675s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9
2023-02-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0675s, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12
2023-02-02SenateHearing: 02/08/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 9
2023-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback