NH SB202 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing a homeownership innovations fund in the New Hampshire housing finance authority.
Title
Relative to establishing a homeownership innovations fund in the New Hampshire housing finance authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2023; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |