NH SB2 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Public Hearing: 01/22/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927250837Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout theday time permitting from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing the preprocessing of absentee ballots for certain 2021 elections and allowing for the postponement of annual town meetings in calendar year 2021 where concerns exist during the COVID-19 health emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the preprocessing of absentee ballots for certain 2021 elections and allowing for the postponement of annual town meetings in calendar year 2021 where concerns exist during the COVID-19 health emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-06 - Senate - Suspension of all Rules Necessary (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-15HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927250837Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout theday time permitting from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law
2021-01-06SenateRead a Third Time, and Final Passage in the early session, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 01/06/2021; Senate Journal 2
2021-01-06SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 0005s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/06/2021; Senate Journal 2
2021-01-06SenateSen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2021-0005s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 01/06/2021; Senate Journal 2
2021-01-06SenateSen. Gray Moved Ought to Pass; 01/06/2021; Senate Journal 2
2021-01-06SenateSen. Bradley Moved Introduction; Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 01/06/2021; Senate Journal 2
2021-01-06SenateSen. Bradley Moved to suspend all rules necessary to permit the consideration of SB 2 at the present time; 2/3 necessary, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 01/06/2021; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1005&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB2
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=996&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=5&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1005
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=6&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1005
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=7&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1005
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=8&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1005
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=9&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1005

Bill Comments

feedback