NH SB2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 2 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to funding for job training programs in the department of business and economic affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to funding for job training programs in the department of business and economic affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - OTP (Y: 207 N: 140 NV: 18 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 216 N: 146 NV: 7 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0106s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateNotwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 2 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
2019-08-13SenateVetoed by Governor 08/09/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-140 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 58
2019-05-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 14
2019-05-15HouseExecutive Session: 05/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-08HouseDivision I Work Session: 05/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Finance 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 27
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1523h and 1842h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 216-146 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 27
2019-05-08HouseFLAM # 2019-1842h (Rep. Sullivan): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 27
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1523h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 27
2019-04-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-04-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1523h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 10
2019-04-17HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-01-31SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0106s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-31SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0106s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0106s, 01/31/2019; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1032&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB2
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=1089&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1089
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1089
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=2&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1032
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=3&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1032
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=181&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1032
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=213&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1032
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=217&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1032
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=229&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0002&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB2&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1032

Bill Comments

feedback