NH SB199 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB199
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 264-77 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 264-77 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to limited driving privileges after an administrative license suspension.
Title
Relative to limited driving privileges after an administrative license suspension.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 264-77 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 22 |
2018-04-05 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Chandley) 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 2 |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/05/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 3 |
2018-03-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-2547s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-2547s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2547s, 01/03/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB199 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9