NH SB198 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electronic publication by the probate division.
Title
Relative to electronic publication by the probate division.
Sponsors
Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Rep. Michael Vose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |