NH SB195 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to insurance continuing education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to insurance continuing education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSpecial Order to After Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback