NH SB195 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB195
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fees for operation of a heating and agitation device in public waters.
Title
Relative to fees for operation of a heating and agitation device in public waters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB195 (Carry Over) 2017-11-07 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study