NH SB195 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Law Without Signature 05/09/15; Eff. Date 07/08/15, Chapter 0041; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Law Without Signature 05/09/15; Eff. Date 07/08/15, Chapter 0041; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging instruction in cursive handwriting and memorization of multiplication tables.
Title
Encouraging instruction in cursive handwriting and memorization of multiplication tables.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Rep. Elisabeth Sanders [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. David Welch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Law Without Signature 05/09/15; Eff. Date 07/08/15, Chapter 0041; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 36, PG. 1597 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 186-155; House Journal 34, PG. 1554 |
2015-04-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-04-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 15-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1308 |
2015-03-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/31/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0922s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2015-0922s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sen. Stiles moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0449s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0449s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0449s, New Title, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4 |