NH SB194 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB194

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing students under age 21 to taste wine in educational settings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing students under age 21 to taste wine in educational settings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8
2023-02-14SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2023-01-25SenateHearing: 01/31/2023, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 8
2023-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5

Same As/Similar To

SB194 (Carry Over) 2023-02-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback