NH SB194 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2015; Chapter 0045 Effective 07/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2015; Chapter 0045 Effective 07/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to epinephrine administration policies in postsecondary educational institutions.
Title
Relative to epinephrine administration policies in postsecondary educational institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2015; Chapter 0045 Effective 07/17/2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/30/2015); Senate Journal 13 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1778 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1425e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1425-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 4/15/2015); House Journal 34, PG. 1564 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1535 |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1302 |
2015-03-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/31/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0448s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Sen. D’Allesandro Floor Amendment #2015-0626s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0448s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Sen. D’Allesandro Moved to Remove SB 194-FN from the Consent Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0448s, 3/5/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4 |