NH SB192 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0077; Effective 06/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0077; Effective 06/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the hours that Lucky 7 tickets may be sold.
Title
Relative to the hours that Lucky 7 tickets may be sold.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
Rep. Bill Bolton [D] | Rep. Timothy Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0077; Effective 06/07/2023 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/18/2023); Senate Journal 16 |
2023-05-31 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/18/2023 |
2023-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 20 |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/26/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/18/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Ways and Means |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0271s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0271s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0271s, 02/09/2023; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 5 |