NH SB192 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 242; Effective 10/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to self-service storage facility liens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to self-service storage facility liens.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 242; Effective 10/10/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2066h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 30
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2066h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 30
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2066h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 10
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-05-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-17House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/25/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/25/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-06SenateHearing: 03/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback