NH SB192 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state contributions to public school renovations.
Title
Relative to state contributions to public school renovations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on the vote on Inexpedient to Legislate on SB 192-FN, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |