NH SB191 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - II. Remainder Effective 07/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - II. Remainder Effective 07/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state energy strategy.
Title
Establishing a state energy strategy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/24/13 |
2013-07-25 | Senate | I. Section 5 Effective 12/31/14 |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/24/13; Chapter 0276 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2183e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2183e Adopted; House Journal 52, PG.1712 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Moved Concur with House Amendment #1900h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1900h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1572-1574 |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment #1900h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1572-1574 |
2013-05-29 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1900h; House Calendar42, PG.1459-1461 |
2013-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1900h for June 5 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1429 |
2013-05-22 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-05-15 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/21/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED== |
2013-05-09 | House | Executive Session: 5/15/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 ==RECESSED== |
2013-05-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/14/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-04-23 | House | Public Hearing: 5/7/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2013-04-17 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 4/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 35, PG.1192 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/28/13; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0805s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0805s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0805s, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 3/6/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 3/6/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |