NH SB190 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2372h for Jan 8 (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to admission fees for certain persons at state parks and historical sites.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to admission fees for certain persons at state parks and historical sites.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass as Amended (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - OTP on Sec 2 of FA 1034s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - OTP of Secs 1&3 of FA 1034s (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - LOT (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2372h for Jan 8 (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-10House==RESCHEDULED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:00 PM -Room Change-LOB 305
2013-10-10HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/7/2013 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-10-10House==CANCELLED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-10-01HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-09-24HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-09-04HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-08-21HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2013 10:00 Amendment Ocean Front Pavilion, Hampton Beach State Park, Ocean Blvd, Hampton Beach
2013-07-19HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/8/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-04-30HouseRetained in Committee
2013-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 4/30/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-04-10HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 4/17/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 4/9/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-03-27HouseIntroduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 31, PG.1076
2013-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1034s, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg;
2013-03-21SenateOught to Pass Section 2, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted
2013-03-21SenateOught to Pass Sections 1 and 3, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted
2013-03-21SenateSen. Larsen Moved Laid On Table SB 190, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed
2013-03-21SenateThe Chair Ruled the Question Divisible: Sections 1 and 3, and Section 2
2013-03-21SenateSen. Pierce Moved to Divide the Question: Sections 1 and 3, and Section 2
2013-03-21SenateSen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2013-1034s
2013-03-21SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Lay on Table Committee Amendment 0759s, Div 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted;
2013-03-21SenateSen. Bradley Moved Remove From Table, Div 12Y-10N, Motion Adopted;
2013-03-14SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7
2013-03-14SenateMotion to Divide the Question: Sections 2-4, and 3, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 7
2013-03-14SenateThe Chair Ruled the Question Divisible: Sections 2-4, and Section 3; Senate Journal 7
2013-03-14SenateSen. Soucy Moved to Divide the Question: Sections 2-4, and Section 3; Senate Journal 7
2013-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0759s, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11
2013-02-06SenateHearing: 2/12/13, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8
2013-01-31SenateIntroduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=394&sy=2013&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2013&q=1
Texthttp://www.gencourt.state.nh.us/legislation/2013/SB0190.html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=18&sy=2013&lb=S&eb=SB0190&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2013&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=394
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=19&sy=2013&lb=S&eb=SB0190&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2013&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=394
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=20&sy=2013&lb=S&eb=SB0190&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2013&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=394
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=21&sy=2013&lb=S&eb=SB0190&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2013&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=394

Bill Comments

feedback