NH SB19 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Conference Committee Report, Not Signed Off; House Calendar47, PG.1542
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Conference Committee Report, Not Signed Off; House Calendar47, PG.1542
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relative to the sale of the former Laconia state school property and eliminating a ramp toll on the Everett turnpike in the town of Merrimack.
Title
Repealing provisions relative to the sale of the former Laconia state school property and eliminating a ramp toll on the Everett turnpike in the town of Merrimack.
Sponsors
Sen. James Rausch [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Rep. David Campbell [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Sen. David Boutin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | House | Conference Committee Report, Not Signed Off; House Calendar47, PG.1542 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/19/2013, 3:00 p.m., Room 100, State House |
2013-06-13 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Campbell, Cloutier, M.Mann, and Waterhouse [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1653 |
2013-06-13 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Davis): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1653 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bragdon, Rausch, Larsen |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Morse Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1632h, New Title; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1632h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1569-1570 |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment #1632h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1569-1570 |
2013-05-22 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1632h (New Title); House Calendar42, PG.1442-1443 |
2013-05-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1632h(NT) for June 5 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1428-1429 |
2013-05-14 | House | Executive Session: 5/22/2013 Legislative Office Building 201 12:00 PM ==Or At House Session Lunch Break== |
2013-05-01 | House | Public Hearing: 5/7/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0767s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0767s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Special Ordered to the end of the Calendar, Without Objection, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0767s, New Title, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/13, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |