NH SB188 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0274; Effective 07/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0274; Effective 07/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to municipally-owned utilities.
Title
Relative to municipally-owned utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0274; Effective 07/24/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2061c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2061c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1680 |
2013-06-19 | House | Conference Committee Report #2013-2061c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar47, PG.1538 |
2013-06-12 | House | Conferee Change: Rep Ratzki Replaces Rep Ebel; House Journal 49, PG.1653 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/13/2013, 2:45 p.m., Room 103, Legislative Office Building |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Campbell, M.Mann, Ebel, and Graham [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1652 |
2013-06-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Chandley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1652 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Rausch, Boutin, Gilmour |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1252h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1252h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1392 |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment #1252h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1392 |
2013-04-23 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1252h; House Calendar36, PG.1221 |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1252h for May 8 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1199 |
2013-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 4/23/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 31, PG.1075 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 2/20/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |