NH SB187 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - V. Remainder Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to OHRV dealer and rental agency registration fees and snowmobile registration fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to OHRV dealer and rental agency registration fees and snowmobile registration fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateV. Remainder Effective 07/12/2019
2019-07-16SenateIV. Sections 2 and 9 Effective 05/01/2023
2019-07-16SenateIII. Paragraph III of Section 12 Effective 11/01/2022
2019-07-16SenateII. Sections 5, 10 and paragraph II of section 12 Effective 07/01/2019
2019-07-16SenateI. Sections 1, 3, 4, 6-8 and paragraph I of Section 12 Effective 05/01/2020
2019-07-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 241
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-17SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2464e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2464e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 46
2019-06-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 26
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 22
2019-05-16HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-05-15HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 26
2019-05-08HousePublic Hearing: 05/15/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Ways and Means 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 26
2019-04-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-04-17HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 12
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/16/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing: 04/09/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-1164s and 2019-1211s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2019-1211s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1164s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSpecial Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSen. Watters Moved to Remove SB 187 from the Consent Calendar; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1164s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-26Senate==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 03/19/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-20Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-20Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback