NH SB180 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the availability of community supervision programs for prisoners released on probation or parole.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the availability of community supervision programs for prisoners released on probation or parole.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] |
Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0126 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 19, Pg.396 | |
2011-05-25 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.1609 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1533 | |
2011-05-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 18 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1320 | |
2011-04-26 | House Executive Session: 5/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-04-19 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/26/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-04-07 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 4/14/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-03-30 | House Public Hearing: 4/7/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 30, PG.1037 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.185 | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 3:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 5, Pg.47 |