NH SB18 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 18 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 18 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to authorized employee wage deductions.
Title
Relative to authorized employee wage deductions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 18 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22 |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/10/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Division Vote 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1548h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7 |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2019-1548h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7 |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1548h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 68 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/31/2019; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |