NH SB177 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1656h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of physical restraints on persons who are involuntarily committed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of physical restraints on persons who are involuntarily committed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1656h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 5
2019-04-30HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-17HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1172s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1172s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1172s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-21SenateHearing: 03/05/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback