NH SB170 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0218; Effective 06/30/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0218; Effective 06/30/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to small group child day care centers.
Title
Relative to small group child day care centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0218; Effective 06/30/2024 |
2023-07-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1899h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 16 |
2023-06-08 | House | Amendment # 2023-1899h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 16 |
2023-05-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1899h 05/17/2023 (Vote 9-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-11 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/17/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2023-05-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/10/2023 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2023-05-04 | House | Public Hearing: 05/10/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Special Committee on Childcare |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0843s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0843s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Murphy Moved to Remove SB 170 from the Consent Calendar; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0843s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |