NH SB17 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB17
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to brew pubs allowing customers to bring dogs to outdoor areas and enabling nano breweries and brew pubs to enter into contracts with contract brewers.
Title
Relative to brew pubs allowing customers to bring dogs to outdoor areas and enabling nano breweries and brew pubs to enter into contracts with contract brewers.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0322s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0024s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0322s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0024s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Special ordered to Thursday, February 11, 2021 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Special ordered to Thursday, February 11, 2021 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0322s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0024s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0322s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0024s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Special ordered to Thursday, February 11, 2021 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Special ordered to Thursday, February 11, 2021 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-10-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-08-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/08/2021 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-05-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive Session: 05/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93883325643 |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing: 03/23/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97167243328 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2021-0024s, and 2021-0322s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0024s, 02/11/2021; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2021-0322s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0024s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Special Order to 02/11/2021, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0024s, 02/04/2021; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/11/2021, 01:10 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2 |
Same As/Similar To
SB17 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308