NH SB169 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the department of environmental services to fund a water main interconnection project between Nashua and Litchfield.
Title
Making an appropriation to the department of environmental services to fund a water main interconnection project between Nashua and Litchfield.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. David Lundgren [R] |
Rep. Douglas Thomas [R] | Rep. Bill Boyd [R] | Rep. Ron Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1029s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-1029s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1029s, 03/23/2023; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 103, State House, 01:10 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 5 |