NH SB169 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB169

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of agritourism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of agritourism.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2017-10-20SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48
2017-02-23SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
2017-02-16SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/23/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2017-02-01SenateHearing: 02/08/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 9
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5

Same As/Similar To

SB169 (Carry Over) 2017-10-20 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback