NH SB167 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 167 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a clean energy resource procurement commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a clean energy resource procurement commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 209 N: 140 NV: 21 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateNotwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 167 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
2019-08-05SenateVetoed by Governor 08/02/2019
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2666e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-09HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2666e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2570c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2570c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-20HouseConference Committee Report # 2019-2570c Filed 06/13/2019; Adopt New Amendment
2019-06-18SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 06/18/2019, 03:00 pm, Room 103, State House
2019-06-12HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Backus, Oxenham, Cali-Pitts, Mann 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 45
2019-06-12HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 45
2019-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Fuller Clark, Watters, Bradley; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1700h and 1851h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 209-140 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 39
2019-05-08HouseFLAM # 2019-1851h (Rep. Somssich): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 39
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1700h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 39
2019-05-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1700h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 11
2019-04-24House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-17House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0737s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-0737s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0662s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0662s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-24SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, State House, 11:20 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1081&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB167
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=1057&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1057
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1057
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=183&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0167&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB167&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1081
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=246&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0167&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB167&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1081

Bill Comments

feedback