NH SB164 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB164

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study repealing the statute of limitations and limitations on actions for sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study repealing the statute of limitations and limitations on actions for sexual assault.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018
2018-04-04HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/12/2018 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 3
2018-04-04HouseExecutive Session: 03/28/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-03-20HousePublic Hearing: 03/28/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2018-01-03SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-2545s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2018-01-03SenateCommittee Amendment # 2017-2545s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2017-12-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2545s, 01/03/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 48
2017-02-17SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6
2017-02-09SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2017-01-25SenateHearing: 01/31/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 8
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5

Same As/Similar To

SB164 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback