NH SB164 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the independent investment committee in the New Hampshire retirement system.
Title
Relative to the independent investment committee in the New Hampshire retirement system.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Raymond Gagnon [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Rep. Mark Proulx [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] | Rep. David Danielson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Hearing: 3/11/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |