NH SB163 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 270; Effective 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to permits for operation of solid waste management facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to permits for operation of solid waste management facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 270; Effective 09/17/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 19
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 7
2019-05-21HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-05-08HousePublic Hearing: 05/14/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Executive Departments and Administration 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 63
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1630h and 1840h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 63
2019-05-08HouseFLAM # 2019-1840h (Rep. Aron): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 63
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1630h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 63
2019-05-08HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Pearl) 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 2
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1630h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
2019-04-08HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0658s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0658s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0658s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback