NH SB163 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0213; Effective 07/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0213; Effective 07/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to wholesale hospital-to-hospital laboratory and testing services.
Title
Relative to wholesale hospital-to-hospital laboratory and testing services.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Rep. Charles McMahon [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0213; Effective 07/06/2015 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102 |
2015-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1826 |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jun 3 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1629 |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/8/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 4/2/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 26, PG. 1275 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/2/15, Room 100, State House, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |