NH SB162 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - III. Remainder Effective 07/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the department of health and human services, the New Hampshire granite advantage health care trust fund, and health facility licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the department of health and human services, the New Hampshire granite advantage health care trust fund, and health facility licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 240 N: 136 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1054s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-13SenateIII. Remainder Effective 07/09/2021
2021-07-13SenateII. Sections 39-40 & 64-66 Effective 07/01/2021
2021-07-13SenateI. Sections 3-4; 6; 10; 12-32 & 67 Effective 09/07/2021
2021-07-13SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0122
2021-07-01HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-01SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1402h and 2021-1763h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 240-136 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 161
2021-06-03HouseLay on Table (Rep. Torosian): Motion Failed DV 157-219 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 161
2021-06-03HouseFLAM # 2021-1763h (Rep. Cushman): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 161
2021-06-03HouseAmendment # 2021-1402h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 159
2021-05-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-05-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1402h (Vote 19-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 24
2021-05-05HouseExecutive Session: 05/17/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95933161404
2021-04-20HousePublic Hearing: 05/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91978983838 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 04/09/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 7 P. 100
2021-04-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1054s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1054s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1054s, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17A
2021-03-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2021-0778s, and 2021-0850s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2021-0850s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0778s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0778s, 03/18/2021; Senate Calendar 15
2021-02-10SenateRemote Hearing: 02/17/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=464&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB162
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=457&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=457
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=457
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=457
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=184&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0162&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB162&ddlsponsors=&lsr=464
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=185&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0162&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB162&ddlsponsors=&lsr=464
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=186&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0162&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB162&ddlsponsors=&lsr=464
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=267&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0162&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB162&ddlsponsors=&lsr=464
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=268&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0162&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB162&ddlsponsors=&lsr=464
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=166&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0162&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB162&ddlsponsors=&lsr=464

Bill Comments 750

feedback