NH SB160 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0217; Effective 10/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of OHRVs on designated trails.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of OHRVs on designated trails.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-09SenateSigned by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0217; Effective 10/03/2023
2023-07-19HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18
2023-07-18SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20
2023-06-15SenateSen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19
2023-06-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2023-1519h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 60
2023-06-08HouseFLAM # 2023-1825h (Rep. Hynes): Amendment Failed Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 59
2023-06-08HouseAmendment # 2023-1519h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 59
2023-05-16HouseRemoved from Consent (Reps. Hynes, Read, Horrigan, Granger, Santonastaso, T. Mannion, Burnham, Gerhard, Hoell, Phillips) 05/16/2023 House Journal 15 P. 3
2023-05-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1519h (NT) 05/03/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2023-04-26HouseExecutive Session: 05/03/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2023-04-12HousePublic Hearing: 04/19/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2023-03-20HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development
2023-02-09SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6
2023-02-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Senate Calendar 9
2023-01-25SenateHearing: 01/31/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback