NH SB160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to swimming and non-motorized boating at public boat access areas.
Title
Relative to swimming and non-motorized boating at public boat access areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 8 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/08/2019 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5 |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-04-02 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0654s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0654s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0654s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |